U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00442
  • Case Name: Contemporary Amperex Technology Co., Ltd v. Powin, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • May 09, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 09, 2025: [File Document Under Seal]
  • May 05, 2025: [Supplement]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 02, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • March 20, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • March 20, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Declination of Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Implied Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge - FORM EVENT]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 19, 2025: [Expedite]
  • March 19, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Remand]
  • March 19, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal]
  • March 17, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 14, 2025: [File Document Under Seal]
  • March 14, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.