U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00436
  • Case Name: Harper v. Amur Equipment Finance, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 30, 2025: [Default Entry]
  • April 30, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: [Declination of Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • April 11, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • April 11, 2025: [Fed R Civ P 26 Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.