U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00435
  • Case Name: Harper v. Watson & Chalin Manufacturing, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Supplement]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Summons/Service Return (All Types)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Declination of Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • April 11, 2025: [Declination of Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • April 11, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
  • April 11, 2025: [Fed R Civ P 26 Agreement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Implied Consent to Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge - FORM EVENT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 09, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 14, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.