U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01747
  • Case Name: Doe et al v. Teachers Council, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.