U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00350
  • Case Name: Kozierachi v. St. Charles Health System
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Service Papers Received]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons/Service Return (All Types)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT]
  • April 08, 2025: [Supplement]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.