U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-01152
  • Case Name: Giustina Land & Timber Co., LLC et al v. Eugene Water & Electric Board et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Protective Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • April 30, 2025: [Opinion and Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 18, 2025: [Leave]
  • March 14, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.