U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00753
  • Case Name: Middleton v. Reyes et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Attorney Substitution]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 24, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 08, 2025: [Attorney Association]
  • April 02, 2025: [Attorney Substitution]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice to Filer of Noncompliance with Prisoner E-filing Program]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.