U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00340
  • Case Name: Stomberg-Tompkins v. State of Oregon
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 05, 2025: [Returned Mail]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 18, 2025: [Application for Leave to Proceed IFP]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Returned Mail]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.