U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00111
  • Case Name: Riddle Laminators, Inc. v. Akzo Nobel Coatings, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Rule 16 Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.