U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00446
  • Case Name: Cascadia Wildlands et al v. Eugene Water & Electric Board
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 09, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 17, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.