U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00445
  • Case Name: Rojas v. State of Oregon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • May 08, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 14, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 20, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • March 17, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • March 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.