U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00771
  • Case Name: Jackson v. Multnomah County
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Application for CMECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party - FORM EVENT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party]
  • April 07, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.