U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-00508
  • Case Name: Thornsberry v. Roberts et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Stay]
  • April 28, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 28, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 14, 2025: [Amend Complaint/Petition]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File AmendedComplaint/Petition]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.