U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00121
  • Case Name: Rose v. Rodriguez et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reimbursement of Out of Pocket Expenses (Pro Bono)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reimbursement of Out of Pocket Expenses (Pro Bono)]
  • May 07, 2025: [Reimbursement of Out of Pocket Expenses (Pro Bono)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Dismissal (60-day) - Terminate Case]
  • April 29, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.