U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00392
  • Case Name: Colon v. Inverness Jail et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Address Change]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File AmendedComplaint/Petition]
  • April 08, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2025: [Amend Complaint/Petition]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 02, 2025: [Address Change]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Returned Mail]
  • March 17, 2025: [Clerks Notice of Mailing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.