U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00411
  • Case Name: Northwest Environmental Defense Center v. City of Cannon Beach
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 08, 2025: [Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 28, 2025: [Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 20, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 19, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Refund Request Due]
  • March 19, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.