U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-00951
  • Case Name: Hawkins v. City of Eugene et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • May 07, 2025: [Leave]
  • May 02, 2025: [Objections to Findings & Recommendation]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Findings & Recommendation Referred]
  • April 22, 2025: [Findings & Recommendation]
  • April 16, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • March 17, 2025: [Amend Complaint/Petition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.