U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02171
  • Case Name: Randall v. State of Oregon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Attorney Substitution]
  • May 07, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 07, 2025: [Motion - Miscellaneous]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Waiver of Service Summons]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Issuance]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Lawsuit - Request for Waiver]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Lawsuit - Request for Waiver]
  • March 17, 2025: [Issuance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 17, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.