U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00454
  • Case Name: McCarrell v. RugsUSA, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 24, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Correction of the Record]
  • April 23, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Acceptance/Acknowledgment of Service]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.