U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01762
  • Case Name: Nees v. Roberts et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 07, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Response to Discovery Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Attorney Substitution]
  • April 22, 2025: [Attorney Substitution]
  • April 21, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 16, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 20, 2025: [Correction of the Record]
  • March 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.