U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01020
  • Case Name: West v. Clackamas County Sheriff's Office et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File AmendedComplaint/Petition]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery/Inspection]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Amend Complaint/Petition]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.