U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01912
  • Case Name: White v. Beaumont
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion]
  • May 05, 2025: [Motion - Miscellaneous]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Attorney Substitution]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Appointment of Counsel]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 01, 2025: [Attorney Substitution]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Acceptance/Acknowledgment of Service - 2254 State Habeas]
  • March 19, 2025: [5 - Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order 2254 & 2241]
  • March 19, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • March 18, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.