U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00458
  • Case Name: Accident Insurance Company, Inc. v. Enchill Painting & Renovation, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons/Service Return (All Types)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Withdrawal of Attorney]
  • March 19, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.