U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00289
  • Case Name: Field v. Roberts et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 09, 2025: [Request]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [6 - Prisoner Civil Rights Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • May 02, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 01, 2025: [Attorney Substitution]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Attorney Substitution]
  • April 22, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice to Filer of Noncompliance with Prisoner E-filing Program]
  • April 18, 2025: [Waiver of Service Summons]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Lawsuit - Request for Waiver]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.