U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-02121
  • Case Name: Martin v. Invictus Protection Agency LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Clerks Notice of Pay.gov Refund]
  • May 06, 2025: [Rule 16 Conference]
  • May 05, 2025: [Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically]
  • May 05, 2025: [Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan]
  • May 02, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Refund Request Due]
  • April 24, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.