U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00462
  • Case Name: Arold et al v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Rule 16 Conference]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 24, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • March 19, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 19, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.