U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00466
  • Case Name: Gordon v. State of Oregon et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Attorney Association]
  • May 08, 2025: [Attorney Substitution]
  • May 06, 2025: [Attorney Substitution]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 17, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 21, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • March 20, 2025: [Case Reassignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • March 19, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 19, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 19, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • March 19, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.