U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01332
  • Case Name: Atkins v. VCE Theaters, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Consent to Join]
  • May 02, 2025: [Consent to Join]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Correction of the Record]
  • April 28, 2025: [Consent to Join]
  • April 25, 2025: [Consent to Join]
  • April 25, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 02, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.