U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00266
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Pfaff et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 01, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2025: [Waiver of Service Summons]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 27, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • March 25, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Dismissal - Party]
  • March 20, 2025: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.