U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01767
  • Case Name: Estate of Aaron D. Stanton et al v. Dyk et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 20, 2025: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.