U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00478
  • Case Name: Wilson v. Safeway, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 12, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Address Change]
  • May 06, 2025: [Address Change]
  • May 02, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 02, 2025: [Disqualification of Counsel]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 24, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Request for Judicial Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 27, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 27, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice]
  • March 20, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 20, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.