U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00037
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Desert Fire LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 12, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 07, 2025: [Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Stay]
  • April 18, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 08, 2025: [Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Stay]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.