U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00213
  • Case Name: Granville v. Beaverton Police Dept. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Terminating Pro Bono Counsel]
  • May 08, 2025: [Pro Bono Appointment Response Form]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Imposition of Sanctions]
  • May 05, 2025: [Appointing Pro Bono Counsel]
  • May 05, 2025: [Terminating Pro Bono Counsel]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 01, 2025: [Pro Bono Appointment Response Form]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appointing Pro Bono Counsel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Terminating Pro Bono Counsel]
  • April 04, 2025: [Pro Bono Appointment Response Form]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Appointing Pro Bono Counsel]
  • March 25, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • March 21, 2025: [Terminating Pro Bono Counsel]
  • March 20, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sanctions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.