U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cr-00409-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Voss
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [9CONV - Set/Reset/Terminate Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of (Generic)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order of Detention (Prob/SR Violation) - FORM EVENT]
  • April 21, 2025: [Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 21, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 18, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 18, 2025: [Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 10, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment & Commitment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Transcript of Proceedings]
  • March 21, 2025: [1- Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Transcript of Proceedings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.