U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00483
  • Case Name: Morrow v. United States et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order ]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Returned Mail]
  • April 04, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed IFP FORM EVENT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • April 04, 2025: [Application for Leave to Proceed IFP]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • March 21, 2025: [Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT]
  • March 21, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.