U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00069
  • Case Name: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company v. Meyden et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Correction of the Record]
  • May 08, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 08, 2025: [Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 28, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 11, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 10, 2025: [Fed R Civ P 26 Agreement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 21, 2025: [Counterclaim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.