U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00485
  • Case Name: Farmers New World Life Insurance Company v. Advanced Surgical Care, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Waiver of Service Summons]
  • April 09, 2025: [Waiver of Service Summons]
  • April 07, 2025: [Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Deposit Funds - Interpleader (28 U.S.C. Section 1335)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 24, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 21, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • March 21, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • March 21, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.