U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00524
  • Case Name: Lott v. Liberty Insurance Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice]
  • May 08, 2025: [Transcript of Proceedings]
  • May 02, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave]
  • April 16, 2025: [Motion Hearing Held]
  • April 09, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 07, 2025: [Sur-Reply to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 21, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.