U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cv-01889
  • Case Name: Burrell v. Carter et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Attorney Substitution]
  • May 12, 2025: [Withdrawal of Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 17, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.