U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00391-11
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez Lopez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Substitution of Defense Attorney]
  • April 21, 2025: [1- Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Release Violation Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Bill of Particulars ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Violation Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue / Reset]
  • April 01, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue/Reset]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.