U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01784
  • Case Name: Wilhite v. Expensify, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 22, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Proposed Joint Case Management Schedule]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • March 24, 2025: [Opinion and Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.