U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00922
  • Case Name: Commercial Fire Protection, LLC v. Pigg et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 08, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • April 07, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.