U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01789
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Bonneville Billing and Collections, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Judgment - Terminate Case]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Imposition of Sanctions]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Reply to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.