U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:23-cv-01745
  • Case Name: Sanderl et al v. St. Charles Health System, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Dismissal (60-day) - Terminate Case]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismissal - Party]
  • April 22, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.