U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01990
  • Case Name: Knapp v. PHH Mortgage Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Objections to Findings & Recommendation]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Findings & Recommendation Referred]
  • April 18, 2025: [Findings & Recommendation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 01, 2025: [Appear]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Stay]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.