U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00487
  • Case Name: Roselund v. Foust
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • May 06, 2025: [Confirmation of Transmittal of Case to State Court]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 24, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 22, 2025: [Transmittal of Case to State Court]
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment - Terminate Case]
  • April 04, 2025: [Show Cause]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Correction of the Record]
  • March 25, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.