U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00568
  • Case Name: Hanson v. Nationwide Insurance Company of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Confirmation of Transmittal of Case to State Court]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Transmittal of Case to State Court]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • March 28, 2025: [Remand]
  • March 26, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 26, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • March 26, 2025: [Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File AmendedComplaint/Petition]
  • March 25, 2025: [Amend Complaint/Petition]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.