U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01318
  • Case Name: Graham v. Butcher
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons Issued]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • April 15, 2025: [Pro Bono Appointment Response Form]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appointing Pro Bono Counsel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Terminating Pro Bono Counsel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Appointing Pro Bono Counsel]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [9CONV - SEAL DOC COURT USER ONLY ROUTINE]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.