U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00328
  • Case Name: Northwest Environmental Defense Center et al v. Pacific Seafood Aquaculture LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Rule 16 Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [1 - Scheduling]
  • April 18, 2025: [Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan]
  • April 04, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2025: [Clerks Review of Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.