U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Oregon

oregon Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Oregon
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00511
  • Case Name: Credeur v. Elevate Workforce Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand]
  • April 29, 2025: [Remand]
  • April 15, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • April 15, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 15, 2025: [Remand]
  • April 03, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response]
  • April 01, 2025: [Attorney Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT]
  • March 26, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.